Audit and Governance Committee Committee Details Description: The committee’s overarching purpose is to provide an independent and high-level focus on the adequacy of governance, risk and control arrangements. Its role in ensuring there is sufficient assurance over governance, risk and control gives greater confidence to all those charged with governance that those arrangements are effective. The committee has oversight of both internal and external audit, together with the financial and governance reports, helping to ensure there are adequate arrangements in place for both internal challenge and public accountability. From May 2023 Standards matters will be dealt with by the Standards Committee. Active: 20 May 2015 - onwards Membership: Fixed Substitutions: All MeetingsMembersOther Information Meetings Display meetings in date range From: September 2024 September 2024 weekMTWTFSS 352627282930311 362345678 379101112131415 3816171819202122 3923242526272829 4030123456 * * To: September 2024 September 2024 weekMTWTFSS 352627282930311 362345678 379101112131415 3816171819202122 3923242526272829 4030123456 * * * Meeting Date - Start Time : End TimeVenueStatusCalendar 1234567 Page 7 of 7, Displaying meetings 61 to 64 of 64 meetings found in selected date range 26 September 2024 - 18:30 : TBCCouncil ChamberScheduled 28 November 2024 - 18:30 : TBCCouncil ChamberScheduled 06 February 2025 - 18:30 : TBCCouncil ChamberScheduled 10 April 2025 - 18:30 : TBCCouncil ChamberScheduled Members Committee Membership Filters Members On: September 2024 September 2024 weekMTWTFSS 352627282930311 362345678 379101112131415 3816171819202122 3923242526272829 4030123456 * * Include Retired Members: PartyNameRoleMembership Dates Conservative Peter Anthony Member 24/05/2023 - current Independent Liz Bickerstaffe Member 24/05/2023 - current Independent Peter Collins Member 08/05/2024 - current Conservative Ellie Gaunt - Lead Member Finance & Resources Member 24/05/2023 - current Independent Paul Hayhurst Member 24/05/2023 - current Conservative John Kirkham Member 24/05/2023 - current Non-Aligned Edward Nash Member 24/05/2023 - current Conservative Andrew Redfearn Vice-Chair 24/05/2023 - current Conservative Michael Withers Chair 24/05/2023 - current Substitutes No Substitute information needs to be specified as the Substitution type is all. Any elected member may substitute. Committee Clerk Name: Sharon Wadsworth Email Address: democracy@fylde.gov.uk Telephone: 01253 658546 Other Information